WA HB1416 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 1/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 1/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the reporting of debt information by insurers to enhance the collection of past-due child support.
Title
Concerning the reporting of debt information by insurers to enhance the collection of past-due child support.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Effective date 1/1/2022. |
2021-05-03 | House | Chapter 168, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-16 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-12 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 23 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |