WA HB1413 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Scoring of prior juvenile offenses in sentencing range calculations.
Title
Scoring of prior juvenile offenses in sentencing range calculations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-15 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-15 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 94a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 94a | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |