WA HB1413 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the purchase of an optional life annuity benefit for certain public retirement system members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the purchase of an optional life annuity benefit for certain public retirement system members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-20SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-18SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-03-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-14HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-14HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-14HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-13HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.

Same As/Similar To

SB5350 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-29 - Effective date 1/1/2020.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback