WA HB1408 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the personal information of juveniles from public disclosure.
Title
Protecting the personal information of juveniles from public disclosure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 69a | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 69a | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |