WA HB1408 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the development of a definition and model for "family engagement coordinator" and other terms used interchangeably with it.
Title
Concerning the development of a definition and model for "family engagement coordinator" and other terms used interchangeably with it.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 79, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2016-01-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-01-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-01-27 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-01-22 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-01-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-14 | House | ED - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Education. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-19 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Education |