WA HB1408 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing minimum standards for victim impact panels.
Title
Establishing minimum standards for victim impact panels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-23 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-12 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-12 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-12 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |