WA HB1406 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving the equity of Washington state's tax code by creating the Washington state wealth tax and taxing extraordinary financial intangible assets.
Title
Improving the equity of Washington state's tax code by creating the Washington state wealth tax and taxing extraordinary financial intangible assets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5426 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-01 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
Subjects
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
CURRENCY
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
TAX PREFERENCES - EXEMPTIONS, CREDITS, DEDUCTIONS, DEFERRALS, ETC.
TAXES, GENERALLY
CURRENCY
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
TAX PREFERENCES - EXEMPTIONS, CREDITS, DEDUCTIONS, DEFERRALS, ETC.
TAXES, GENERALLY
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 135 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 32 | 655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |