WA HB1401 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning hemp production.
Title
Concerning hemp production.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-08 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5719 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.