WA HB1399 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 1/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing barriers to professional licensure for individuals with previous criminal convictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing barriers to professional licensure for individuals with previous criminal convictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseEffective date 1/1/2022.
2021-05-03HouseChapter 194, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-03HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-14HousePassed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-04-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10SenateCommittee amendment
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-25SenateBFST - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-23SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-04SenateFirst reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
2021-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-25HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-19HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-15HouseCPB - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-27HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1399&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1399.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1399.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1399.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1399%20AMS%20BFST%20S2322.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1399%20AMS%20HASE%20S2327.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1399%20AMS%20HASE%20S2712.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1399%20AMS%20ENGR%20S2322.E.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1399%20HBA%20CPB%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1399%20HBR%20CPB%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1399%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1399%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1399%20SBA%20BFST%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1399%20SBR%20BFST%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1399%20SBR%20BFST%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1399%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1399%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1399%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124101&actionText=CPB%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28650&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124101&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28618&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124101&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1399&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124101&actionText=BFST%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28816&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124101&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1399&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124101&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-14-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1399&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback