WA HB1395 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Ensuring equity in farming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring equity in farming.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-10HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-10HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-10HouseRDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-10HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-27HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback