WA HB1391 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prime contractor bidding submission requirements on public works contracts.
Title
Concerning prime contractor bidding submission requirements on public works contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2021-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-17 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5356 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.