WA HB1391 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing improvements to the early achievers program as reviewed and recommended by the joint select committee on the early achievers program.
Title
Implementing improvements to the early achievers program as reviewed and recommended by the joint select committee on the early achievers program.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-13 | House | Chapter 369, 2019 Laws PV. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-05 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5484 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.