WA HB1390 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting local governments and state agencies from mandating the installation of fire sprinkler systems in agricultural structures.
Title
Prohibiting local governments and state agencies from mandating the installation of fire sprinkler systems in agricultural structures.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. Terry Nealey [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] | Rep. Cathy Dahlquist [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1390&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1390.pdf |