WA HB1384 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public improvement contracts involving certain federally funded transportation projects.
Title
Concerning public improvement contracts involving certain federally funded transportation projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Rep. Judith Clibborn [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-03 | Chapter 231, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-03 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-29 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-28 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-28 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-08 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2011-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-22 | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-22 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-03 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-20 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |