WA HB1384 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the debt limit of the housing finance commission.
Title
Increasing the debt limit of the housing finance commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Capital Budget. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-03 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-03 | CB - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-03 | CB - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-03 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-02 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5452 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1384&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1384.pdf |