WA HB1383 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning respiratory care practitioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning respiratory care practitioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21HouseEffective date 7/1/2022.
2021-04-21HouseChapter 114, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-21HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-16HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-16SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-12HousePassed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-03-29SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-29SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-29SenateCommittee amendment
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-16SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-15SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-15SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-02-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-24House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-11HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1889010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1889040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1889050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1889090Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1383&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1383.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1383-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1383-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1383-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1383-S%20AMS%20HLTC%20S2061.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1383-S%20AMS%20MUZZ%20S2284.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1383-S%20AMS%20ENGR%20S2061.E.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1383%20HBA%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1383%20HBR%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1383-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1383-S%20SBA%20HLTC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1383-S%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1383-S%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1383-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1383-S%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1383-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124071&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28556&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124071&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-24-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1383&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124071&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28840&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124071&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-29-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1383&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124071&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1383&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback