WA HB1377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning affordable housing development on religious organization property.
Title
Concerning affordable housing development on religious organization property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-30 | House | Chapter 218, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 85; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5358 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.