WA HB1377 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding public facilities district formation and authority.
Title
Regarding public facilities district formation and authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Finance. | |
2009-02-16 | CEDT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | CEDT - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development & Trade. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5296 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.