WA HB1375 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning liquor licensee privileges for the delivery of alcohol.
Title
Concerning liquor licensee privileges for the delivery of alcohol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-14 | House | RSG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5448 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/1/2023.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
66 | 04 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 20 | 310 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 20 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
66 | 24 | 660 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |