WA HB1370 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing the payment of awards to whistleblowers who report violations of state or federal securities laws and providing protection to whistleblowers and internal reporters.
Title
Providing the payment of awards to whistleblowers who report violations of state or federal securities laws and providing protection to whistleblowers and internal reporters.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Chris Corry [R] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-20 | House | Chapter 149, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | BFGT - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2023-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-07 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
42 | 56 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 320 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |