WA HB1368 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Effective date 2/19/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Effective date 2/19/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Responding to the COVID-19 pandemic through state actions supported by federal funding.
Title
Responding to the COVID-19 pandemic through state actions supported by federal funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | House | Effective date 2/19/2021. |
2021-02-26 | House | Chapter 3, 2021 Laws. |
2021-02-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-02-17 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-02-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-01 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-02-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-01-29 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2021-01-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-28 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5344 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Subjects
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT
BUDGETS
BUSINESSES
CHILDREN, YOUTH, AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT
COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, INDIVIDUALS WITH
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
HEALTH AND SAFETY, PUBLIC
HEALTH CARE FACILITIES
HOMES AND HOUSING
LONG-TERM CARE
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
STUDENT ACHIEVEMENT COUNCIL
BUDGETS
BUSINESSES
CHILDREN, YOUTH, AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT
COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, INDIVIDUALS WITH
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
HEALTH AND SAFETY, PUBLIC
HEALTH CARE FACILITIES
HOMES AND HOUSING
LONG-TERM CARE
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
STUDENT ACHIEVEMENT COUNCIL