WA HB1368 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reauthorizing the business and occupation tax deduction for cooperative finance organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reauthorizing the business and occupation tax deduction for cooperative finance organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11HousePassed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-09SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-09SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-09SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-27SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27SenateENET - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-03SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2020-01-30SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-01-28SenatePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-27SenatePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2019-04-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-04-26HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-26HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-25HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-03-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-26HouseFIN - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-21HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1368&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1368.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1368.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118037&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1368&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118037&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-30-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1368&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118037&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1368&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118037&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1368&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback