WA HB1367 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning child-placing agencies.
Title
Concerning child-placing agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Chris Corry [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-29 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5645 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1367&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1367.pdf |