WA HB1363 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing secondary trauma in the K-12 workforce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing secondary trauma in the K-12 workforce.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-26HouseChapter 129, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-26HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-20HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-15SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10SenatePlaced on second reading.
2021-03-18SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-17SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-17SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-17SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2021-02-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-25House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-10HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-09HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-09HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-09HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-04HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-02HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a300New CodeSee Bill Text
28a400New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1363&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1363.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1363-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/1363-S.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/1363-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1363-S%20AMS%20HAWK%20S2911.1.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1363%20HBA%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1363%20HBR%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1363-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1363-S%20SBA%20EDU%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1363-S%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1363-S%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1363-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1363-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1363-S%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124030&actionText=ED%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28595&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124030&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1363&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124030&actionText=EDU%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28829&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124030&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1363&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback