WA HB1363 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating tanning facilities.
Title
Regulating tanning facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-21 | APPH - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-21 | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Health & Human Services Appropriations & Oversight. | |
2011-02-17 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-17 | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-19 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |