WA HB1357 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning voters' pamphlets for overseas and service voters.
Title
Concerning voters' pamphlets for overseas and service voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | House | Chapter 193, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:30 AM. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2022-01-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-01-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-01-12 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2022-01-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2021-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-18 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-11 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29a | 32 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 72 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |