WA HB1357 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating certain requirements for the annexation of an unincorporated island of territory.
Title
Eliminating certain requirements for the annexation of an unincorporated island of territory.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Local Government. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5249 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.