WA HB1357 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tribal-state relations.
Title
Concerning tribal-state relations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | House | 3rd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-30 | House | CDHT - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-21 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB5511 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.