WA HB1355 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Updating property tax exemptions for service-connected disabled veterans and senior citizens.
Title
Updating property tax exemptions for service-connected disabled veterans and senior citizens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-20 | House | Chapter 147, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-21 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
84 | 36 | 383 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 36 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 38 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |