WA HB1354 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning suicide review teams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning suicide review teams.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-22HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-15HouseCYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-11HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4370New CodeSee Bill Text
7002050Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1354&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1354.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1354-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1354-S2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1354%20HBA%20CYF%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1354%20HBR%20CYF%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1354%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123747&actionText=CYF%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28662&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123747&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28691&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback