WA HB1348 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing medical assistance to incarcerated persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing medical assistance to incarcerated persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-05-03HouseChapter 166, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-03HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-24SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-16HousePassed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10SenateCommittee amendment
2021-04-10SenatePlaced on second reading.
2021-03-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-25SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2021-02-26HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-26HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-26House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-25HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-18HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness.
2021-02-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-11HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-04HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7409670Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1348&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1348.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1348-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1348-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1348-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1348-S%20AMS%20HSRR%20S2302.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1348%20HBA%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1348%20HBR%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1348%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1348-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1348-S%20SBA%20HSRR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1348-S%20SBR%20HSRR%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1348-S%20SBR%20HSRR%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1348-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1348-S%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1348-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123739&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28556&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123739&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%201st%20substitute%20bill%20proposed%20by%20Health%20Care%20%26amp%3B%20Wellness.&mId=28619&isInit=False&biennium=20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123739&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-26-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1348&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123739&actionText=HSRR%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28935&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123739&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1348&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123739&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1348&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback