WA HB1347 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Children, Youth & Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Children, Youth & Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning exceptional foster care maintenance payments.
Title
Concerning exceptional foster care maintenance payments.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Eric Robertson [R] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] |
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. April Berg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 13 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |