WA HB1344 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing qualifying persons serving long sentences committed prior to reaching 25 years of age to seek review for possible release from incarceration.
Title
Allowing qualifying persons serving long sentences committed prior to reaching 25 years of age to seek review for possible release from incarceration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 95 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
10 | 95 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 540 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 570 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 728 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |