WA HB1341 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-22 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Regulated Substances & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning cannabis license ownership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning cannabis license ownership.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-22HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM.
2024-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 4:00 PM.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-01-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming.

Same As/Similar To

SB5377 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6950325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6950331Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback