WA HB1341 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the professional rescue doctrine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the professional rescue doctrine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-09HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-09HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-02HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-21HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
424New CodeSee Bill Text
8004440Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback