WA HB1341 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 7/7/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 7/7/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning professional certification for teachers and school administrators.
Title
Concerning professional certification for teachers and school administrators.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | Effective date 7/7/2017. |
2017-07-07 | House | Chapter 26, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session PV. |
2017-07-07 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2017-07-03 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2017-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-16 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Education |