WA HB1340 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Effective date 4/27/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Effective date 4/27/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning actions by health professions disciplining authorities against license applicants and license holders.
Title
Concerning actions by health professions disciplining authorities against license applicants and license holders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate on Reconsideration (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | House | Effective date 4/27/2023. |
2023-04-27 | House | Chapter 192, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-19 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-14 | House | Vote on final passage will be reconsidered. |
2023-04-14 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2023-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-28 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-02-28 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-01-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-01-27 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5400 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 130 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 130 | 055 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 130 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |