WA HB1339 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Native American voting rights act of Washington.
Title
Enacting the Native American voting rights act of Washington.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5079 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-14 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1339&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1339.pdf |