WA HB1338 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning education and vocational programs in state correctional institutions.
Title
Concerning education and vocational programs in state correctional institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-26 | House | PEW - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
2024-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-17 | House | PEW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-08 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2023-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
72 | 09 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 09 | 460 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 09 | 465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |