WA HB1337 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the interstate medical licensure compact.
Title
Creating the interstate medical licensure compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage without Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-05 | House | Chapter 195, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-05 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-21 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2017-04-13 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2017-02-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-03 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB5221 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.