WA HB1336 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective date 7/23/2023**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Splitting the volunteer firefighters' and reserve officers' relief and pension principal fund into two accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Splitting the volunteer firefighters' and reserve officers' relief and pension principal fund into two accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13HouseEffective date 7/23/2023**.
2023-04-13HouseChapter 73, 2023 Laws.
2023-04-13HouseGovernor signed.
2023-04-07HouseDelivered to Governor.
2023-04-04SenatePresident signed.
2023-04-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-03-31SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2023-03-31SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-24SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-03-20SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-03-16SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2023-03-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2023-03-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2023-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2023-03-02HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2023-03-02HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-02HouseFloor amendment
2023-02-21HousePlaced on second reading.
2023-02-21HouseRemoved from Suspension Calendar.
2023-02-14HousePlaced on second reading suspension calendar.
2023-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2023-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-01HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.

Same As/Similar To

SB5567 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4124New CodeSee Bill Text
4124010Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
4124030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4124035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4384092Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1336&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1336.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1336.E.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/1336.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/1336.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1336%20AMH%20STOK%20PRIN%20694.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1336%20HBA%20APP%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1336%20HBR%20APP%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1336.E%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1336.E%20SBA%20WM%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1336.E%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1336.E%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1336.E%20HBR%20PL%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1336.E%20SBR%20APS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1336.E%20HBR%20FBR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66172
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66173
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66304
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127916&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30577&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127916&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-02-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1336&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127916&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=31015&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127916&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-31-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1336&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback