WA HB1333 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-25 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an extension to the local sales and use tax for public facilities in rural counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing an extension to the local sales and use tax for public facilities in rural counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-25SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-23SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-23SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-22SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-03House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-24HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-19HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8214370Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1333&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1333.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1333-S.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1333-S%20AMS%20SCHO%20S2291.2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1333%20HBA%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1333%20HBR%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1333-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1333-S%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1333-S%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1333-S%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123689&actionText=FIN%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28671&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123689&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1333&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123689&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28894&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback