WA HB1331 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning early learning facility impact fees.
Title
Concerning early learning facility impact fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | House | Chapter 72, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2021-02-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-09 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |