WA HB1329 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a sales tax holiday for back-to-school clothing and supplies.
Title
Creating a sales tax holiday for back-to-school clothing and supplies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1329&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1329.pdf |