WA HB1328 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing employment opportunities for spouses of military members.
Title
Increasing employment opportunities for spouses of military members.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-05 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5772 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.