WA HB1326 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning coroners and medical examiners.
Title
Concerning coroners and medical examiners.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021*. |
2021-04-26 | House | Chapter 127, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 88; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2021-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-05 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 16 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 50 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 50 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |