WA HB1325 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Implementing policies related to children and youth behavioral health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing policies related to children and youth behavioral health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-26HouseChapter 126, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-26HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-20HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-15SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-04-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2021-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-04-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-19SenateBH - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-10SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-03-10SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-02-26HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-26HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-26House2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-17HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-17HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-03HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-03HouseCYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7124061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7409520Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1325&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1325.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1325-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1325-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1325-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1325-S2.SL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1325%20HBA%20CYF%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1325%20HBR%20CYF%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1325%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1325-S2%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1325-S2%20SBA%20BH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1325-S2%20SBR%20BH%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1325-S2%20SBR%20BH%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1325-S2%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1325-S2%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1325-S2%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1325-S2%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1325-S2%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123679&actionText=CYF%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28460&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123679&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28620&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123679&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-26-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1325&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123679&actionText=BH%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28815&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123679&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28996&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123679&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-08-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1325&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback