WA HB1323 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the long-term services and supports trust program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the long-term services and supports trust program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-21HouseChapter 113, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-21HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-16HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-16SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-16HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-14HousePassed final passage; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10SenateCommittee amendment
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-26SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-24SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-02-23HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-23HouseVote on third reading will be reconsidered.
2021-02-23HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-23HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-23House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-12HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-10HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-10HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-10HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-10HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-03HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50b04New CodeSee Bill Text
50b04010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50b04020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50b04050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50b04085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50b04090Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1323&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1323.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1323-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1323-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1323-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1323-S%20AMH%20CALD%20BLAC%20016.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1323-S%20AMH%20CALD%20BLAC%20017.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1323-S%20AMH%20CORR%20BLAC%20018.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1323-S%20AMS%20HLTC%20S2353.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1323-S%20AMS%20FORT%20S2641.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1323-S%20AMS%20FORT%20S2644.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1323-S%20AMS%20KING%20S2647.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1323-S%20AMS%20SHOR%20S2642.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1323-S%20AMS%20BRAU%20S2651.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1323-S%20AMS%20CLEV%20S2745.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1323-S%20AMS%20MUZZ%20S2844.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1323-S%20AMS%20MUZZ%20S2920.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1323-S%20AMS%20ENGR%20S2353.E.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1323%20HBA%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1323%20HBR%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1323-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1323-S%20SBA%20HLTC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1323-S%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1323-S%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1323-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1323-S%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1323-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123664&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28555&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123664&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-23-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1323&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123664&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28924&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123664&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1323&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123664&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-14-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1323&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback