WA HB1320 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning access to personnel records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning access to personnel records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20HouseHouse Rules "X" file.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-04-23HouseBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2023-04-03SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2023-03-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:45 PM.
2023-03-27SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2023-03-23SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2023-03-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2023-03-23SenateLC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2023-03-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2023-03-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2023-03-03SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2023-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2023-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-01HouseFloor amendment
2023-03-01House2nd substitute bill substituted
2023-02-28HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-24HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2023-02-24HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2023-02-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2023-02-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-15HouseLAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM.
2023-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.

Same As/Similar To

SB5061 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4912250Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1320&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1320.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1320-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1320-S2.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1320-S2.E.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1320-S2%20AMH%20CONN%20TANG%20055.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1320-S2%20AMH%20SCHM%20TANG%20056.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1320-S2%20AMH%20ROBE%20TANG%20057.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1320-S2%20AMH%20ROBE%20TANG%20058.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1320-S2%20AMH%20REED%20TANG%20059.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1320-S2.E%20AMS%20LC%20S2585.1.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1320%20HBA%20LAWS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1320%20HBR%20LAWS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1320%20HBR%20APP%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1320-S2.E%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1320-S2.E%20SBA%20LC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1320-S2.E%20SBR%20LC%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1320-S2.E%20SBR%20LC%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1320-S2.E%20SBA%20WM%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1320-S2.E%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67121
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67565
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67567
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67895
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67903
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68170
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68306
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68372
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68831
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127903&actionText=LAWS%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30784&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127903&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30813&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127903&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1320&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127903&actionText=LC%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=31097&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback