WA HB1320 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/1/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/1/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing, harmonizing, and improving the efficacy and accessibility of laws concerning civil protection orders.
Title
Modernizing, harmonizing, and improving the efficacy and accessibility of laws concerning civil protection orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Effective date 7/1/2022*. |
2021-05-10 | House | Chapter 215, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 55; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-01 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-01 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-10 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5297 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Subjects
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
FIREARMS
HARASSMENT
PROTECTION ORDERS
SEX OFFENSES AND OFFENDERS
STALKING
VULNERABLE ADULTS
FIREARMS
HARASSMENT
PROTECTION ORDERS
SEX OFFENSES AND OFFENDERS
STALKING
VULNERABLE ADULTS